MD HB155 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-16 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 400
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-16 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 400
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Altering certain requirements for the licensing and regulation of audiologists, hearing aid dispensers, speech-language pathologists, and music therapists, including clarifying quorum requirements for the State Board of Examiners for Audiologists, Hearing Aid Dispensers, Speech-Language Pathologists, and Music Therapists, license reciprocity, professional disciplinary grounds, and delegation authority for audiologists.
Title
State Board of Examiners for Audiologists, Hearing Aid Dispensers, Speech-Language Pathologists, and Music Therapists - Revisions
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-04 - Senate - Third Reading Passed 46-0 (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-17 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 130 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2022-02-17 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 130 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-16 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 400 |
2022-04-05 | House | Returned Passed |
2022-04-04 | Senate | Third Reading Passed 46-0 |
2022-04-01 | Senate | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2022-04-01 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2022-02-18 | Senate | Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2022-02-17 | House | Third Reading Passed (130-0) |
2022-02-15 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2022-02-14 | House | Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations |
2022-01-20 | House | Hearing 1/20 at 4:30 p.m. |
2022-01-20 | House | Hearing canceled |
2022-01-19 | House | Hearing 1/20 at 4:00 p.m. |
2022-01-20 | House | Hearing canceled |
2022-01-12 | House | Hearing 1/20 at 2:30 p.m. |
2022-01-12 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
2021-10-28 | House | Pre-filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB103 (Crossfiled) 2022-05-16 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 399
Subjects
Art, Music, and Cultural Affairs
Audiologists and Speech Pathologists
Committees and Commissions
Deaf Persons
Discipline
Ethics
Health Occupations
Hearing Aids
Licenses
Rehabilitation
Rules and Regulations
Work, Labor, and Employment
Audiologists and Speech Pathologists
Committees and Commissions
Deaf Persons
Discipline
Ethics
Health Occupations
Hearing Aids
Licenses
Rehabilitation
Rules and Regulations
Work, Labor, and Employment
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Health Occupations | 2 | 201 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health Occupations | 2 | 204 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health Occupations | 2 | 205.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health Occupations | 2 | 301 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health Occupations | 2 | 314 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health Occupations | 2 | 319 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health Occupations | 2 | 4A-14 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health Occupations | 2 | 4A-21 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |