MD HB1543 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 68-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-02-11 - Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m. (Economic Matters) and Hearing canceled (Environment and Transportation)
Pending: House Economic Matters Committee
Hearing: Mar 6 @ 1:00 pm House Environment and Transportation Hearing
Hearing: Mar 12 @ 1:00 pm House Economic Matters Hearing
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Establishing a Climate Crisis Initiative in the Department of the Environment for certain purposes; requiring the Secretary of the Environment to administer certain schedules of greenhouse gas pollution fees; requiring the Secretary to delegate certain collection and benefit functions to the Comptroller; requiring the Comptroller to carry out certain functions; requiring the collection of a certain greenhouse gas pollution fee on certain fuels for certain purposes; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Environment – Climate Crisis and Education Act

Sponsors

Del. David Fraser-hidalgo [D]Del. Gabriel Acevero [D]Del. Vanessa Atterbeary [D]Del. Heather Bagnall [D]
Del. Ben Barnes [D]Del. Erek Barron [D]Del. Regina Boyce [D]Del. Talmadge Branch [D]
Del. Tony Bridges [D]Del. Benjamin Brooks [D]Del. Alice Cain [D]Del. Jon Cardin [D]
Del. Alfred Carr [D]Del. Mark Chang [D]Del. Lorig Charkoudian [D]Del. Nick Charles [D]
Del. Luke Clippinger [D]Del. Charlotte Crutchfield [D]Del. Bonnie Cullison [D]Del. Eric Ebersole [D]
Del. Jessica Feldmark [D]Del. Diana Fennell [D]Del. Wanika Fisher [D]Del. James Gilchrist [D]
Del. Michele Guyton [D]Del. Andrea Harrison [D]Del. Anne Healey [D]Del. Terri Hill [D]
Del. Marvin Holmes [D]Del. Julian Ivey [D]Del. Michael Jackson [D]Del. Steve Johnson [D]
Del. Ariana Kelly [D]Del. Ken Kerr [D]Del. Marc Korman [D]Del. Mary Lehman [D]
Del. Jazz Lewis [D]Del. Robbyn Lewis [D]Del. Brooke Lierman [D]Del. Mary Ann Lisanti [D]
Del. Lesley Lopez [D]Del. Sara Love [D]Del. Maggie McIntosh [D]Del. David Moon [D]
Del. Nick Mosby [D]Del. Julie Palakovich Carr [D]Del. Edith Patterson [D]Del. Joseline Pena-Melnyk [D]
Del. Shane Pendergrass [D]Del. Elizabeth Proctor [D]Del. Lily Qi [D]Del. Kirill Reznik [D]
Del. Mike Rogers [D]Del. Samuel Rosenberg [D]Del. Sheila Ruth [D]Del. Emily Shetty [D]
Del. Stephanie Smith [D]Del. Jared Solomon [D]Del. Dana Stein [D]Del. Vaughn Stewart [D]
Del. Jen Terrasa [D]Del. Veronica Turner [D]Del. Kriselda Valderrama [D]Del. Courtney Watson [D]
Del. Melissa Wells [D]Del. Jheanelle Wilkins [D]Del. Nicole Williams [D]Del. Pat Young [D]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-11HouseHearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m. (Economic Matters) and Hearing canceled (Environment and Transportation)
2020-02-10HouseHearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m. (Economic Matters) and Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
2020-02-10HouseHearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
2020-02-07HouseFirst Reading Economic Matters and Environment and Transportation

Same As/Similar To

SB912 (Crossfiled) 2020-02-03 - First Reading Budget and Taxation and Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Environment21201(n/a)See Bill Text
Environment21202(n/a)See Bill Text
Environment21214(n/a)See Bill Text
Environment21215(n/a)See Bill Text
Environment21216(n/a)See Bill Text
Environment21217(n/a)See Bill Text
Environment21218(n/a)See Bill Text
Environment21219(n/a)See Bill Text
Environment21220(n/a)See Bill Text
Environment21221(n/a)See Bill Text
Environment21222(n/a)See Bill Text
Environment21223(n/a)See Bill Text
Environment21224(n/a)See Bill Text
Environment21225(n/a)See Bill Text
Environment21226(n/a)See Bill Text
Environment21227(n/a)See Bill Text
Environment21228(n/a)See Bill Text
State Finance and Procurement6226(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback