MD HB1542 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Enrolled on April 7 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-04-07 - Passed Enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring, subject to the receipt of certain funding, the Department of Commerce, in conjunction with the Department of Veterans Affairs and the Department of Labor, Licensing, and Regulation, to conduct a study on employment in the State's defense industry; specifying the minimum requirements of the study; requiring the Department of Commerce to consult with certain entities; requiring the Department of Commerce to report, on or before June 30, 2019, to the General Assembly on the findings of the study; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Department of Commerce – Employment in the State’s Defense Industry – Study

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-01 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (44-0) (Y: 45 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-03-30 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (135-0) (Y: 136 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-03-12 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (134-1) (Y: 135 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 10) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-07HousePassed Enrolled
2018-04-07HouseThird Reading Passed (135-0)
2018-04-07HouseHouse Concur - Senate Amendments
2018-04-06SenateThird Reading Passed with Amendments (44-0)
2018-04-05SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2018-04-05SenateFavorable with Amendments {317372/1 Report Adopted
2018-04-04SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Finance
2018-04-03SenateHearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-03-16SenateFirst Reading Finance
2018-03-15HouseThird Reading Passed (134-1)
2018-03-14HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2018-03-14HouseFavorable with Amendments {623892/1 Report Adopted
2018-03-14HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
2018-03-07HouseHearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-02-09HouseFirst Reading Economic Matters

Subjects


Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?id=hb1542&stab=01&pid=billpage&tab=subject3&ys=2018rs
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/bills/hb/hb1542f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/bills/hb/hb1542t.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/bills/hb/hb1542e.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2018RS/amds/bil_0002/hb1542_62389201.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2018RS/amds/bil_0002/hb1542_31737201.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/fnotes/bil_0002/hb1542.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes_comm/hb1542_ecm.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes/House/0436.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes_comm/hb1542_fin.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes/House/1333.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes/Senate/1249.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback