MD HB154 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB120
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 24 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-25 - Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 24 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-25 - Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring each county board of education to adopt, implement, and publish certain guidelines in accordance with the Maryland State school health service guidelines to reduce the risk of exposure to anaphylactic causative agents in classrooms and common areas; requiring each county board to publish the guidelines on its website; requiring each public school to develop a system to disclose, reasonably in advance, the foods served in the school and the major food allergens contained in the food; etc.
Title
Public Schools - Anaphylactic Food Allergies - Guidelines and Requirements
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-24 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 134 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-25 | Senate | Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2022-02-24 | House | Third Reading Passed (134-0) |
2022-02-22 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2022-02-22 | House | Favorable with Amendments {123420/1 Adopted |
2022-02-21 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means |
2022-01-17 | House | Hearing 1/27 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-01-12 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
2021-09-28 | House | Pre-filed |
Same As/Similar To
HB154 (Carry Over) 2022-02-25 - Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB95 (Crossfiled) 2022-01-20 - Hearing 2/03 at 1:00 p.m.
SB95 (Crossfiled) 2022-01-20 - Hearing 2/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Subjects
Communications
Disclosure
Education, Boards of
Food
Health
Health Occupations
internet
Medical Conditions
Notices
Parents and Guardians
Primary and Secondary Education
Public Schools
Safety
School Administration
Signs and Billboards
Students
Teachers
Disclosure
Education, Boards of
Food
Health
Health Occupations
internet
Medical Conditions
Notices
Parents and Guardians
Primary and Secondary Education
Public Schools
Safety
School Administration
Signs and Billboards
Students
Teachers