MD HB1539 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 484
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Establishing the Maryland Efficient Grant Application Council to study and make recommendations to the Governor's Grants Office and the Department of Budget and Management regarding the entire life cycle of a grant and the creation of certain materials for use by certain grant-making agencies, grant applicants, and grant recipients; requiring the Council to solicit the input of certain stakeholders; requiring the Council to submit its findings and recommendations to the General Assembly on or before July 1, 2024; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Grant Applications and Reporting - Uniform Forms and Requirements

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-18 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 131 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2020-03-17 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-15 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 132 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-05-08HouseEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 484
2020-03-18HousePassed Enrolled
2020-03-18HouseThird Reading Passed (131-0)
2020-03-18HouseHouse Concurs Senate Amendments
2020-03-17SenateThird Reading Passed (45-0)
2020-03-17SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2020-03-17SenateFavorable with Amendments {804736/1 Adopted
2020-03-17SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2020-03-15SenateReferred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2020-03-15HouseThird Reading Passed (132-0)
2020-03-14HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2020-03-14HouseFavorable with Amendments {126884/1 Adopted
2020-03-14HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
2020-02-10HouseHearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-02-07HouseFirst Reading Health and Government Operations

Same As/Similar To

SB630 (Crossfiled) 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 485

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
State Finance and Procurement2209(n/a)See Bill Text
State Finance and Procurement2210(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback