MD HB1535 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-14 - Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-14 - Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Allowing a credit against the State income tax for the total installed costs of specified HVAC air stratification technology installed on or after January 1, 2017; providing that the credit may not exceed a specified amount; providing that the credit may not be carried forward to another taxable year; requiring a taxpayer claiming the credit to attach proof of the total installed costs to the taxpayer's return; applying the Act to taxable years beginning after December 31, 2016; etc.
Title
Income Tax Credit - HVAC Air Stratification Technology
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-14 | House | Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-02-27 | House | Rereferred to Ways and Means |
2017-02-15 | House | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations |