MD HB1534 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 17 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-03-17 - Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Establishing the Urban Agriculture Grant Program in the Department of Agriculture to increase the viability of urban farming and improve access to urban-grown foods; establishing an Urban Agriculture Grant Fund to provide grants to nonprofit organizations in Baltimore City to implement the Program; requiring the Secretary of Agriculture to administer the Fund; authorizing the distribution of up to $400,000 to the Fund for each of fiscal years 2022 and 2025; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Department of Agriculture - Urban Agriculture Grant Program

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-17 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 130 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 8) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-17SenateReferred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2020-03-17HouseThird Reading Passed (130-0)
2020-03-15HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2020-03-15HouseFavorable with Amendments {260418/1 Adopted
2020-03-15HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
2020-02-10HouseHearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-02-07HouseFirst Reading Environment and Transportation

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Agriculture22001(n/a)See Bill Text
Agriculture22002(n/a)See Bill Text
Agriculture22003(n/a)See Bill Text
Agriculture22004(n/a)See Bill Text
Agriculture22005(n/a)See Bill Text
Commercial Law17317(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback