MD HB1533 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-03-13 - Reassigned to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizing an individual who is employed by the State or a county or municipality in the State to perform marine contractor services while in the performance of the duties of their employment without having to obtain a marine contractor license under certain circumstances; and exempting certain individuals who perform marine contractor services while in the performance of the duties of their employment from paying certain fees.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Marine Contractor License – Performance of Services – Licensing Requirements and Fees

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-12 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 133 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-13SenateReassigned to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2020-03-13SenateReferred Judicial Proceedings
2020-03-12HouseThird Reading Passed (133-0)
2020-03-12HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2020-03-12HouseFavorable with Amendments {850316/1 Adopted
2020-03-12HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
2020-02-10HouseHearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-02-07HouseFirst Reading Environment and Transportation

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Environment17301(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback