MD HB1532 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 14-5)
Status: Passed on May 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-08 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 404
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 14-5)
Status: Passed on May 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-08 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 404
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing the Maryland Loan Assistance Repayment Program for Farmers; requiring the Office of Student Financial Assistance in the Maryland Higher Education Commission to assist in the repayment of a higher education loan obtained for tuition, education expenses, or living expenses for undergraduate or graduate study leading to a degree in agriculture or an agriculture-related field, including farming; requiring the Office, in consultation with the Department of Agriculture, to adopt certain regulations; etc.
Title
Higher Education - Maryland Loan Assistance Repayment Program - Farmers
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-30 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-15 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (135-0) (Y: 136 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-03-15 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (135-0) (Y: 136 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-08 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 404 |
2018-04-05 | House | Returned Passed |
2018-04-04 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2018-04-03 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2018-04-03 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2018-04-02 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2018-03-19 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2018-03-19 | House | Third Reading Passed (135-0) |
2018-03-17 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2018-03-17 | House | Favorable with Amendments {535763/1 Report Adopted |
2018-03-16 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means |
2018-03-08 | House | Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-02-09 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
Subjects
Agriculture
Agriculture, Department of
Environment, Department of
Farmland
Higher Education
Reimbursement Rates
Reports
Rules and Regulations
Salaries and Compensation
Scholarships and Student Financial Aid
Time
Tuition
Agriculture, Department of
Environment, Department of
Farmland
Higher Education
Reimbursement Rates
Reports
Rules and Regulations
Salaries and Compensation
Scholarships and Student Financial Aid
Time
Tuition