MD HB1531 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-2)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-04-09 - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Establishing the Task Force on the Premature Discharge of Patients With Substance Use Disorders to study certain practices and procedures at certain facilities and to make recommendations on necessary changes to improve patient treatment, training for staff, and reporting on early patient discharge; requiring the Task Force to report its findings and recommendations to the Governor and the General Assembly on or before January 1, 2019; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Task Force on the Premature Discharge of Patients With Substance Use Disorders

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-09HouseUnfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
2018-03-02HouseHearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-02-09HouseFirst Reading Health and Government Operations

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback