MD HB1528 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-15 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 696
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-15 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 696
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the Department of Human Services to use certain unexpended funds to establish a certain arrearage prevention program; providing the purpose and intent of the program is a one-time grant of money to establish ongoing arrearage prevention activities in the State; providing for the Department to select certain program recipients for certain purposes; requiring the Department, for fiscal year 2019, to dedicate $750,000 of unexpended funds in the Electric Universal Service Program to the arrearage prevention program; etc.
Title
Electric Universal Service Program - Funds - Arrearage Prevention
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-29 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-13 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 138 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2018-03-13 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 138 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-15 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 696 |
2018-04-04 | House | Returned Passed |
2018-04-03 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2018-04-02 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2018-04-02 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2018-04-02 | Senate | Favorable Report by Finance |
2018-03-29 | Senate | Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-03-16 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
2018-03-16 | House | Third Reading Passed (137-0) |
2018-03-15 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2018-03-15 | House | Favorable with Amendments {783893/1 Report Adopted |
2018-03-15 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters |
2018-03-01 | House | Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-02-09 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
Subjects
Alternative Energy Sources
Committees and Commissions
Equipment
Housing and Community Development, Department of
Human Services, Department of
Social Services
Social Services - Generally
Utilities
Utility Regulation
Committees and Commissions
Equipment
Housing and Community Development, Department of
Human Services, Department of
Social Services
Social Services - Generally
Utilities
Utility Regulation