MD HB1525 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-02-24 - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring the pay scale for a certain physician position in a certain facility to be the same as the pay scale for a certain psychiatrist position; requiring certain nursing positions to receive a certain upward adjustment in their pay scales when there is an upward adjustment to the pay scales for initial appointments to certain positions; requiring the pay scale for security attendants at a certain facility to be at least equal to the pay scale for correctional officers; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Maryland Department of Health and Motor Vehicle Administration - Medical, Nursing, and Security Personnel

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-24HouseHearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-02-24HouseHearing canceled
2020-02-10HouseHearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-02-07HouseFirst Reading Appropriations

Same As/Similar To

SB639 (Crossfiled) 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 572

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Health - General10415(n/a)See Bill Text
Transportation2103.4(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback