MD HB1524 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-3)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-02-10 - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Health and Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring, beginning on January 1, 2021, certain invitations to bid and certain requests for proposals to require bidders and offerors to provide certain documentation; requiring the Department of Public Safety and Correctional Services and county departments of corrections to give a preference to certain bidders and offerors based on the number of formerly incarcerated individuals the bidder or offeror employs; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Procurement and Correctional Facilities - Employment Opportunities for Formerly Incarcerated Individuals

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-10HouseHearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-02-07HouseFirst Reading Health and Government Operations

Same As/Similar To

SB858 (Crossfiled) 2020-02-06 - Hearing 2/26 at 12:00 p.m. (Judicial Proceedings)

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Correctional Services8-7A01(n/a)See Bill Text
Correctional Services8-7A2(n/a)See Bill Text
Correctional Services8-7A3(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback