MD HB1523 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-10 - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-10 - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the creation of a State Debt not to exceed $1,000,000, the proceeds to be used as a grant to the Board of Directors of CASA de Maryland, Inc. for the acquisition, planning, design, construction, repair, renovation, reconstruction, site improvement, and capital equipping of the Baltimore Regional Education and Training Center, located in Baltimore City; providing for disbursement of the loan proceeds, subject to a requirement that the grantee provide and expend a matching fund; etc.
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Baltimore City - Baltimore Regional Education and Training Center
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-10 | House | Unfavorable Report by Appropriations |
2017-03-11 | House | Hearing 3/11 at 10:00 a.m. |
2017-02-27 | House | Rereferred to Appropriations |
2017-02-13 | House | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations |
Subjects
Baltimore City
Community Facilities and Services
Immigrants and Citizenship
State Bonds
State Debt (Bond Bills)
Community Facilities and Services
Immigrants and Citizenship
State Bonds
State Debt (Bond Bills)