MD HB1522 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-2)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-03-18 - Unfavorable Report by House Rules and Executive Nominations; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Providing that a public general law may not be construed to limit a power or function of a local government unless the public general law specifically states that it limits concurrent jurisdiction or that the State's jurisdiction is exclusive; providing for the construction of the Act; and applying the Act prospectively.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

General Provisions - Public General Law - Preemption of Local Laws

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-18HouseUnfavorable Report by House Rules and Executive Nominations; Withdrawn
2020-02-28HouseHearing canceled
2020-02-12HouseHearing 3/02 at 2:00 p.m.
2020-02-12HouseHearing canceled
2020-02-10HouseHearing 2/24 at 2:00 p.m.
2020-02-07HouseFirst Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations

Same As/Similar To

SB756 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-11 - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
General Provisions1404(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback