MD HB1518 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-03-13 - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring the Social Services Administration, in consultation with the local departments of social services, to establish a pilot program in Allegany, Garrett, and Washington counties to communicate with a certain opioid-addicted parent through a mobile application; requiring the local departments of social services in Allegany, Garrett, and Washington counties, if appropriate, to communicate with a certain opioid-addicted parent through a certain mobile application under certain circumstances; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Opioid-Exposed Newborns and Parents Addicted to Opioids - Mobile Application - Pilot Program (I'm Alive Today App)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-13HouseUnfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
2020-03-11HouseHearing canceled
2020-02-14HouseHearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-02-11HouseHearing canceled
2020-02-11HouseHearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-02-07HouseFirst Reading Health and Government Operations

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Family Law5704.2(n/a)See Bill Text
Family Law5704.5(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback