MD HB1518 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-8)
Status: Enrolled on April 9 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-04-09 - Passed Enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring the Secretary of Health, by December 1 each year, to submit a report to the Governor and the General Assembly on the findings, recommendations, and actions of the Maternal Mortality Review Program and to include a summary of certain stakeholder meetings; requiring the Secretary to convene certain meetings of certain stakeholders at least twice a year; requiring one of those meetings to be held within 90 days after submission of the report reviewing issues concerning disparities in maternal deaths; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public Health - Maternal Mortality Review Program - Report and Stakeholder Meetings

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-02 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (140-0) (Y: 141 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-04-01 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (44-0) (Y: 45 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-03-15 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 138 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-09HousePassed Enrolled
2018-04-09HouseThird Reading Passed (140-0)
2018-04-09HouseHouse Concur - Senate Amendments
2018-04-06SenateThird Reading Passed with Amendments (44-0)
2018-04-05SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2018-04-05SenateFavorable with Amendments {497578/1 Report Adopted
2018-04-04SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Finance
2018-04-03SenateHearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-03-19SenateFirst Reading Finance
2018-03-19HouseThird Reading Passed (137-0)
2018-03-16HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2018-03-16HouseFavorable with Amendments {326188/1 Report Adopted
2018-03-16HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
2018-03-13HouseHearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-02-09HouseFirst Reading Health and Government Operations

Subjects


Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?id=hb1518&stab=01&pid=billpage&tab=subject3&ys=2018rs
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/bills/hb/hb1518f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/bills/hb/hb1518t.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/bills/hb/hb1518e.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2018RS/amds/bil_0008/hb1518_32618801.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2018RS/amds/bil_0008/hb1518_49757801.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/fnotes/bil_0008/hb1518.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes_comm/hb1518_hgo.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes/House/0638.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes_comm/hb1518_fin.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes/Senate/1248.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes/House/1448.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback