MD HB1516 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 37-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-04-03 - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Establishing Healthy Maryland as a public corporation and a unit of State government to provide comprehensive universal health coverage for every Maryland resident; requiring Healthy Maryland to provide certain services, a certain system, certain choice and access to certain coordinators and certain providers, and certain financing for residents of the State on or before January 1, 2020; establishing the Health Maryland Board to organize, administer, and market Healthy Maryland and Healthy Maryland Services as a single-payer program; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public Health - Healthy Maryland Program - Establishment (Healthy Maryland Act of 2018)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-03HouseUnfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
2018-03-05HouseHearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-02-09HouseFirst Reading Health and Government Operations

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback