MD HB1514 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 483
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring the Secretary of Juvenile Services to take certain actions related to certain protections and remedies for certain employees; prohibiting a supervisor, appointing authority, or the head of a principal unit of State government from taking or refusing to take any personnel action or reprisal against an employee of the Department of Juvenile Services who discloses certain information to the Director of Juvenile Justice Monitoring or staff of the Juvenile Justice Monitoring Unit; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State Personnel and Pensions - Maryland Whistleblower Law - Department of Juvenile Services Employees

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-18 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-16 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 131 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-05-08HouseEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 483
2020-03-18HouseReturned Passed
2020-03-18SenateThird Reading Passed (45-0)
2020-03-18SenateSecond Reading Passed
2020-03-18SenateFavorable Adopted
2020-03-18SenateFavorable Report by Finance
2020-03-16SenateHearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-03-16SenateReferred Finance
2020-03-16HouseThird Reading Passed (131-0)
2020-03-15HouseFavorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
2020-03-15HouseFavorable Report by Appropriations
2020-02-10HouseHearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-02-07HouseFirst Reading Appropriations

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
State Government6401(n/a)See Bill Text
State Personnel and Pensions5304(n/a)See Bill Text
State Personnel and Pensions5305(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback