MD HB1513 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-02-11 - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Repealing certain provisions of law regarding educational programs for juveniles in residential facilities; establishing a Juvenile Services Education System; establishing the Board of Education for the Juvenile Services Education System; requiring the Board to have the authority and responsibility for all functions relating to the juvenile services educations programs in the State beginning July 1, 2021; requiring each county board of education to pay to the Board a certain cost for certain juveniles; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Education - Juvenile Services Education System - Establishment, Powers, and Duties

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-11HouseHearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)
2020-02-07HouseFirst Reading Ways and Means and Judiciary

Same As/Similar To

SB798 (Crossfiled) 2020-02-05 - Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Education22301(n/a)See Bill Text
Education22302(n/a)See Bill Text
Education22303(n/a)See Bill Text
Education22304(n/a)See Bill Text
Education22305(n/a)See Bill Text
Education22306(n/a)See Bill Text
Education22307(n/a)See Bill Text
Education22308(n/a)See Bill Text
Education22309(n/a)See Bill Text
Education22310(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback