MD HB1511 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-26 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 844
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-26 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 844
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Altering a certain provision of law limiting the amount of a finder's fee that may be charged by a mortgage broker obtaining a mortgage loan with respect to the same property more than once within a 24-month period.
Title
Credit Regulation - Mortgage Brokers - Finder's Fee
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-29 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-14 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-0) (Y: 137 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2018-03-14 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-0) (Y: 137 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-26 | House | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 844 |
2018-04-04 | House | Returned Passed |
2018-04-03 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2018-04-02 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2018-04-02 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2018-04-02 | Senate | Favorable Report by Finance |
2018-03-29 | Senate | Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-03-19 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
2018-03-19 | House | Third Reading Passed (136-0) |
2018-03-17 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2018-03-17 | House | Favorable with Amendments {103792/1 Report Adopted |
2018-03-17 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters |
2018-03-07 | House | Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-02-09 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |