MD HB1509 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 9 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-09 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 503
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 9 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-09 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 503
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing the Baltimore Regional Water Governance Model Workgroup to study the regional water governance approach in the Baltimore region; requiring the Governor to include an appropriation of $500,000 in the annual budget bill for the Workgroup; and requiring the Workgroup to report, on or before June 30, 2027, its findings to the Mayor of Baltimore City, the County Executive of Baltimore County, the Governor, and the General Assembly.
Title
Baltimore Regional Water Governance Model Workgroup - Established
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-08 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 41 N: 3 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-02 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 105 N: 32 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-04-02 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 105 N: 32 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-09 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 503 |
2024-04-08 | House | Returned Passed |
2024-04-08 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (41-3) |
2024-04-08 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2024-04-08 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2024-04-08 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Energy, and the Environment |
2024-04-05 | Senate | Rereferred to Education, Energy, and the Environment |
2024-04-03 | Senate | Referred Rules |
2024-04-02 | House | Third Reading Passed (105-32) |
2024-04-02 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2024-04-01 | House | Motion Special Order until 4/2 (Delegate Grammer) Adopted |
2024-04-01 | House | Favorable with Amendments {953723/1 Adopted |
2024-04-01 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation |
2024-03-09 | House | Hearing 3/12 at 3:00 p.m. |
2024-03-09 | House | Hearing canceled |
2024-03-08 | House | Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m. |
2024-03-04 | House | Rereferred to Environment and Transportation |
2024-02-21 | House | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations |
Same As/Similar To
SB1174 (Crossfiled) 2024-04-08 - Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Subjects
Appropriations
Baltimore City
Baltimore County
Committees and Commissions
Debt Management
Environment
Environmental Justice
Environmental Matters
Flood Control
Independent Contractors
Prices
Public Local Laws
Public Officials
Reports
Retirement
Sunset
Utilities
Wastewater
Water
Work, Labor, and Employment
Baltimore City
Baltimore County
Committees and Commissions
Debt Management
Environment
Environmental Justice
Environmental Matters
Flood Control
Independent Contractors
Prices
Public Local Laws
Public Officials
Reports
Retirement
Sunset
Utilities
Wastewater
Water
Work, Labor, and Employment