MD HB1507 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-02-11 - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Economic Matters Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Removing a certain type of hydraulic elevator in a privately owned building from a requirement for a certain test; requiring that, beginning October 1, 2022, a certain annual test on a certain type of hydraulic elevator in a privately owned building be performed by a licensed elevator mechanic in the presence of a third-party qualified elevator inspector; altering a certain date to October 1, 2021, on which certain elevator inspections are required to begin; and requiring the Secretary of Labor to make certain reports.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public Safety - Hydraulic Elevator Inspections - Privately Owned Buildings

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-11HouseHearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-02-07HouseFirst Reading Economic Matters

Same As/Similar To

SB618 (Crossfiled) 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 569

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Public Safety12801(n/a)See Bill Text
Public Safety12806(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback