MD HB1506 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-15 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 794
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizing the Securities Commissioner of the Division of Securities of the Office of the Attorney General to bring a civil action for damages against a certain person that violates certain provisions of law on behalf of a certain person; authorizing the Commissioner to recover certain damages; authorizing the Commissioner to recover certain costs under certain circumstances; providing that a certain criminal conviction is not a prerequisite for maintenance of an action under the Act; and applying the Act.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Office of the Attorney General - Securities Commissioner - Asset Recovery for Exploited Seniors

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-05 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-08 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (131-6) (Y: 132 N: 7 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-15HouseApproved by the Governor - Chapter 794
2018-04-10HouseReturned Passed
2018-04-09SenateThird Reading Passed (46-0)
2018-04-09SenateSecond Reading Passed
2018-04-09SenateFavorable Report Adopted
2018-04-09SenateFavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
2018-03-21SenateHearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-03-09SenateFirst Reading Judicial Proceedings
2018-03-08HouseThird Reading Passed (131-6)
2018-03-07HouseSecond Reading Passed
2018-03-07HouseFavorable Report Adopted
2018-03-06HouseFavorable Report by Economic Matters
2018-02-28HouseHearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-02-09HouseFirst Reading Economic Matters

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback