MD HB1505 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 17 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-03-17 - Referred Judicial Proceedings
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Altering the mileage at which the owner of a Class F (tractor) vehicle that has been in operation for not more than 5 years is required to have the vehicle inspected, maintained, and repaired to 35,000 miles; and altering the mileage at which the owner of certain Class E vehicles that have been in operation for not more than 5 years are required to have the vehicle inspected, maintained, and repaired to 50,000 miles, if the vehicles are zero-emission electric vehicles or fuel cell electric vehicles.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Commercial Motor Vehicles - Inspections

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-17 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 133 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-17SenateReferred Judicial Proceedings
2020-03-17HouseThird Reading Passed (133-0)
2020-03-16HouseFavorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
2020-03-16HouseFavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
2020-02-10HouseHearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-02-07HouseFirst Reading Environment and Transportation

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Transportation13916(n/a)See Bill Text
Transportation13919(n/a)See Bill Text
Transportation13923(n/a)See Bill Text
Transportation23301(n/a)See Bill Text
Transportation23302(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback