MD HB1500 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 481
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizing a code county in the Eastern Shore class to establish certain special taxing districts, impose certain ad valorem or special taxes, and issue certain bonds for the purpose of financing the cost of certain infrastructure improvements.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Special Taxing Districts - Eastern Shore Code Counties - Authorization

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-17 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-12 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 132 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-05-08HouseEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 481
2020-03-18HouseReturned Passed
2020-03-17SenateThird Reading Passed (45-0)
2020-03-17SenateSecond Reading Passed
2020-03-17SenateFavorable Adopted
2020-03-16SenateFavorable Report by Budget and Taxation
2020-03-13SenateReferred Budget and Taxation
2020-03-12HouseThird Reading Passed (132-0)
2020-03-12HouseFavorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
2020-03-12HouseFavorable Report by Ways and Means
2020-02-10HouseHearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-02-07HouseFirst Reading Ways and Means

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Local Government21502(n/a)See Bill Text
Local Government21503(n/a)See Bill Text
Local Government21504(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback