MD HB1498 | 2016 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-1)
Status: Introduced on February 12 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-16 - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring at least 75% of packaged food and beverage options offered in a food and beverage vending machine located on property owned or managed by the State to be healthy food and beverage options; providing that specified packaged food and beverage options may not contain more than a specified amount of trans fat or a specified amount of sodium; requiring healthy food or beverage options to be displayed and stocked in a specified manner; establishing requirements that must be met to be considered a healthy food option; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Maryland Healthy Vending Machine Act

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2016-03-16HouseUnfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
2016-03-09HouseHearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
2016-02-15HouseHearing cancelled
2016-03-15HouseHearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
2016-02-12HouseFirst Reading Economic Matters

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback