MD HB1494 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-03-15 - Referred Budget and Taxation
Pending: Senate Budget and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizing a county to impose the county income tax on an income bracket basis under certain circumstances; requiring a county that imposes the county income tax on an income bracket basis to set, by ordinance or resolution, certain income brackets; prohibiting the income brackets from differing from the income brackets to which the State income tax applies; prohibiting a county that imposes the county income tax on an income tax bracket basis from setting a minimum income tax rate less than 2.25%; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

County Income Tax – Authority to Impose on an Income Bracket Basis

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-14 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 94 N: 35 NV: 3 Abs: 9) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-15SenateReferred Budget and Taxation
2020-03-14HouseThird Reading Passed (94-35)
2020-03-13HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2020-03-13HouseFavorable with Amendments {555661/1 Adopted
2020-03-13HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
2020-02-10HouseHearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-02-07HouseFirst Reading Ways and Means

Same As/Similar To

SB1040 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-03 - Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Tax - General10106(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback