MD HB1494 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB133
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-15 - Referred Budget and Taxation
Pending: Senate Budget and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-15 - Referred Budget and Taxation
Pending: Senate Budget and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing a county to impose the county income tax on an income bracket basis under certain circumstances; requiring a county that imposes the county income tax on an income bracket basis to set, by ordinance or resolution, certain income brackets; prohibiting the income brackets from differing from the income brackets to which the State income tax applies; prohibiting a county that imposes the county income tax on an income tax bracket basis from setting a minimum income tax rate less than 2.25%; etc.
Title
County Income Tax – Authority to Impose on an Income Bracket Basis
Sponsors
Del. Nick Mosby [D] | Del. Alice Cain [D] | Del. Eric Ebersole [D] | Del. Marc Korman [D] |
Del. Mary Lehman [D] | Del. Julie Palakovich Carr [D] | Del. Stephanie Smith [D] | Del. Vaughn Stewart [D] |
Del. Pat Young [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-14 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 94 N: 35 NV: 3 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-15 | Senate | Referred Budget and Taxation |
2020-03-14 | House | Third Reading Passed (94-35) |
2020-03-13 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2020-03-13 | House | Favorable with Amendments {555661/1 Adopted |
2020-03-13 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means |
2020-02-10 | House | Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-02-07 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
Same As/Similar To
HB1494 (Carry Over) 2020-03-15 - Referred Budget and Taxation
SB1040 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-03 - Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
SB1040 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-03 - Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Tax - General | 10 | 106 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |