MD HB1493 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 12 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-12 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 140
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 12 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-12 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 140
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Decreasing from 25 to 10 the number of full-time jobs a specified applicant must plan to create in order to be eligible for a direct loan or grant from the Economic Development Incentive Fund in Calvert County.
Title
Calvert County - Economic Development Incentive Fund - Eligibility Criteria
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-01 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-17 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (133-0) (Y: 133 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2016-03-17 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (133-0) (Y: 133 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-12 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 140 |
2016-04-07 | House | Returned Passed |
2016-04-07 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Favorable Report by Finance |
2016-04-05 | Senate | Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-03-21 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
2016-03-19 | House | Third Reading Passed (133-0) |
2016-03-18 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2016-03-18 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2016-03-16 | House | Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation |
2016-03-11 | House | Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-02-12 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
Subjects
Calvert County
Commerce and Business
Counties - Local Laws
Economic and Community Development
Grants
Loans
Revenue and Taxes
Work, Labor and Employment
Commerce and Business
Counties - Local Laws
Economic and Community Development
Grants
Loans
Revenue and Taxes
Work, Labor and Employment