MD HB1491 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-08 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 532
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-08 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 532
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Repealing certain provisions of law authorizing the Public Service Commission to authorize the use of a master meter in a residential multiple occupancy building for certain purposes under certain circumstances; requiring the Commission to conduct a certain study on the feasibility of transitioning master meters installed and used for gas or electric to energy allocation systems or submeters in apartment buildings or complexes, condominiums, and housing cooperatives; providing for the required elements of the study; etc.
Title
Public Service Commission – Repeal of Master Metering Authorization and Study on Energy Allocation Systems and Submetering
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-26 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-03-25 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 138 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-03-11 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 139 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-03-25 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 138 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-03-11 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 139 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-08 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 532 |
2018-04-03 | House | Passed Enrolled |
2018-04-03 | House | Third Reading Passed (137-0) |
2018-04-03 | House | House Concur - Senate Amendments |
2018-03-29 | Senate | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (45-0) |
2018-03-28 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2018-03-28 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {827272/1 Report Adopted |
2018-03-28 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-03-15 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
2018-03-14 | House | Third Reading Passed (138-0) |
2018-03-08 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2018-03-08 | House | Favorable with Amendments {903499/1 Report Adopted |
2018-03-07 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters |
2018-02-22 | House | Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-02-09 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
Subjects
Apartments
Condominiums
Cooperative Associations
Energy Matters
Housing
Public Service Commission
Reports
Sunset
Utilities
Utility Regulation
Condominiums
Cooperative Associations
Energy Matters
Housing
Public Service Commission
Reports
Sunset
Utilities
Utility Regulation