MD HB1488 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 28-14)
Status: Vetoed on May 7 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-07 - Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Establishing the Office for the Certified Local Farm Enterprise Program in the Department of Agriculture; establishing the Certified Local Farm Enterprise Program in the Office to encourage certain units to try to achieve an overall percentage goal of 20% of the unit's total dollar value of procurement contracts for food from certain certified local farm enterprises; establishing a Certified Local Farm Enterprise Food Aggregation Grant Fund; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Certified Local Farm Enterprise Program and Certified Local Farm Enterprise Food Aggregation Grant Fund - Establishment

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-17 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-15 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 131 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-05-07HouseVetoed by the Governor (Policy)
2020-03-18HouseReturned Passed
2020-03-17SenateThird Reading Passed (45-0)
2020-03-17SenateFavorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
2020-03-17SenateFavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2020-03-15SenateReferred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2020-03-15HouseThird Reading Passed (131-0)
2020-03-14HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2020-03-14HouseFavorable with Amendments {706589/1 Adopted
2020-03-14HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
2020-02-10HouseHearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-02-07HouseFirst Reading Health and Government Operations

Same As/Similar To

SB985 (Crossfiled) 2020-05-07 - Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
State Finance and Procurement11203(n/a)See Bill Text
State Finance and Procurement14701(n/a)See Bill Text
State Finance and Procurement14702(n/a)See Bill Text
State Finance and Procurement14703(n/a)See Bill Text
State Finance and Procurement14704(n/a)See Bill Text
State Finance and Procurement14705(n/a)See Bill Text
State Finance and Procurement14706(n/a)See Bill Text
State Finance and Procurement14707(n/a)See Bill Text
State Finance and Procurement14708(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback