MD HB1488 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 33-0)
Status: Passed on May 19 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-19 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 654
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 33-0)
Status: Passed on May 19 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-19 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 654
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing the Maryland Corps Program; providing for stipends of up to $15,000 for corps participants and one-time scholarships of up to $6,000 for corps participants who complete the Program; requiring the Board of Directors to issue a Request for Proposals for an operator for the Program on or before June 1, 2017, that includes specified elements and expectations; providing that funds for the Program will be as provided in the State budget in specified fiscal years for specified purposes; etc.
Title
Service, Stipends, and Scholarships - Maryland Corps Program - Established
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-01 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (38-8) (Y: 38 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-17 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (88-46) (Y: 88 N: 46 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2016-03-17 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (88-46) (Y: 88 N: 46 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-19 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 654 |
2016-04-07 | House | Returned Passed |
2016-04-07 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (38-8) |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2016-04-05 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2016-03-21 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs and Finance |
2016-03-19 | House | Third Reading Passed (88-46) |
2016-03-17 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2016-03-17 | House | Favorable with Amendments {214460/1 Report Adopted |
2016-03-17 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations |
2016-03-08 | House | Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-02-12 | House | First Reading Appropriations |
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Appropriations
Auditors and Audits
Committees and Commissions
Comptroller
Economic and Community Development
Education - Miscellaneous
Gifts
Grants
Higher Education
Interest
Job Training
Nonprofit Organizations
Primary and Secondary Education
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Salaries and Compensation
Scholarships and Student Financial Aid
Treasurers
Volunteers
Youth
Appropriations
Auditors and Audits
Committees and Commissions
Comptroller
Economic and Community Development
Education - Miscellaneous
Gifts
Grants
Higher Education
Interest
Job Training
Nonprofit Organizations
Primary and Secondary Education
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Salaries and Compensation
Scholarships and Student Financial Aid
Treasurers
Volunteers
Youth