MD HB1486 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-18 - Referred to interim study by Ways and Means
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-18 - Referred to interim study by Ways and Means
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Professional Standards and Teacher Education Board, on or before January 1, 2019, to require a candidate for a certificate to teach specified students to pass a test of research-based reading instruction; requiring the Board and the State Board of Education jointly to set the passing score for the test, subject to a specified condition; requiring the Board and the State Board jointly to set standards for the delivery of research-based reading instruction by teacher preparation programs in the State; etc.
Title
Teachers and Teacher Preparation Programs - Research-Based Reading Instruction
Sponsors
Del. Dana Stein [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-18 | House | Referred to interim study by Ways and Means |
2017-03-07 | House | Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-02-10 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
Subjects
Assessments
Committees and Commissions
Continuing Education
Education, State Board of
Primary and Secondary Education
Teachers
Committees and Commissions
Continuing Education
Education, State Board of
Primary and Secondary Education
Teachers