MD HB1483 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-24 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 287
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizing a court to include in an order appointing a guardian of the person of a disabled person the duty to foster and preserve certain family relationships under certain circumstances.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Duties of a Guardian of the Person - Visitation

Sponsors

Del. Sid Saab [R]Del. Christopher Adams [R]Del. Kathy Afzali [R]Del. Bilal Ali [D]
Del. Curtis Anderson [D]Del. Carl Anderton [R]Del. Angela Angel [D]Del. Steven Arentz [R]
Del. Vanessa Atterbeary [D]Del. Susan Aumann [R]Del. Charles Barkley [D]Del. Ben Barnes [D]
Del. Darryl Barnes [D]Del. Erek Barron [D]Del. Kumar Barve [D]Del. Pamela Beidle [D]
Del. Wendell Beitzel [R]Del. Talmadge Branch [D]Del. Eric Bromwell [D]Del. Benjamin Brooks [D]
Del. Jason Buckel [R]Del. Ned Carey [D]Del. Mary Carozza [R]Del. Alfred Carr [D]
Del. Andrew Cassilly [R]Del. Mark Chang [D]Del. Barrie Ciliberti [R]Del. Jerry Clark [R]
Del. Luke Clippinger [D]Del. John Cluster [R]Del. Frank Conaway [D]Del. Paul Corderman [R]
Del. Bonnie Cullison [D]Del. Dereck Davis [D]Del. Eric Ebersole [D]Del. William Folden [R]
Del. David Fraser-hidalgo [D]Del. William Frick [D]Del. Barbara Frush [D]Del. Jeff Ghrist [R]
Del. Angela Gibson [D]Del. James Gilchrist [D]Del. Glen Glass [R]Del. Cheryl Glenn [D]
Del. Robin Grammer [R]Del. Ana Gutierrez [D]Del. Antonio Hayes [D]Del. Keith Haynes [D]
Del. Shelly Hettleman [D]Del. Terri Hill [D]Del. Sheila Hixson [D]Del. Marvin Holmes [D]
Del. Kevin Hornberger [R]Del. Carolyn Howard [D]Del. Seth Howard [R]Del. Richard Impallaria [R]
Del. Michael Jackson [D]Del. Jay Jacobs [R]Del. Sally Jameson [D]Del. Ariana Kelly [D]
Del. Nicholaus Kipke [R]Del. Trent Kittleman [R]Del. Marc Korman [D]Del. Benjamin Kramer [D]
Del. Susan Krebs [R]Del. Carol Krimm [D]Del. Clarence Lam [D]Del. Brooke Lierman [D]
Del. Mary Ann Lisanti [D]Del. Bob Long [R]Del. Eric Luedtke [D]Del. Michael Malone [R]
Del. Johnny Mautz [R]Del. Susan McComas [R]Del. Tony McConkey [R]Del. Cory McCray [D]
Del. Patrick McDonough [R]Del. Mike Mckay [R]Del. Herbert McMillan [R]Del. Ric Metzgar [R]
Del. Christian Miele [R]Del. Aruna Miller [D]Del. Warren Miller [R]Del. David Moon [D]
Del. Marice Morales [D]Del. Matt Morgan [R]Del. Dan Morhaim [D]Del. Nick Mosby [D]
Del. Charles Otto [R]Del. Joseline Pena-Melnyk [D]Del. Andrew Platt [D]Del. Elizabeth Proctor [D]
Del. Teresa Reilly [R]Del. Deb Rey [R]Del. Shane Robinson [D]Del. April Rose [R]
Del. Sheree Sample-Hughes [D]Del. Carlos Sanchez [D]Del. Haven Shoemaker [R]Del. Meagan Simonaire [R]
Del. Kathy Szeliga [R]Del. James Tarlau [D]Del. Frank Turner [D]Del. Kriselda Valderrama [D]
Del. Geraldine Valentino-Smith [D]Del. Joseph Vallario [D]Del. David Vogt [R]Del. Mary Washington [D]
Del. Chris West [R]Del. C.T. Wilson [D]Del. William Wivell [R]Del. Karen Young [D]
Del. Pat Young [D]Del. Samuel Rosenberg [D]

Roll Calls

2018-04-03 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 139 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-04-03 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-03-15 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-0) (Y: 137 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-24HouseApproved by the Governor - Chapter 287
2018-04-09HousePassed Enrolled
2018-04-09HouseThird Reading Passed (138-0)
2018-04-09HouseHouse Concur - Senate Amendments
2018-04-09SenateThird Reading Passed with Amendments (45-0)
2018-04-09SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2018-04-09SenateFavorable with Amendments {548272/1 Report Adopted
2018-04-09SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
2018-03-28SenateHearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-03-19SenateFirst Reading Judicial Proceedings
2018-03-19HouseThird Reading Passed (136-0)
2018-03-19HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2018-03-19HouseFavorable with Amendments {356783/3 Report Adopted
2018-03-19HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
2018-02-28HouseHearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-02-09HouseFirst Reading Health and Government Operations

Subjects


Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?id=hb1483&stab=01&pid=billpage&tab=subject3&ys=2018rs
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/bills/hb/hb1483f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/bills/hb/hb1483t.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/bills/hb/hb1483e.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/Chapters_noln/CH_287_hb1483e.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2018RS/amds/bil_0003/hb1483_35678303.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2018RS/amds/bil_0003/hb1483_54827201.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/fnotes/bil_0003/hb1483.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes_comm/hb1483_hgo.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes/House/0719.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes_comm/hb1483_jpr.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes/House/1478.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes/Senate/1351.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback