MD HB148 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-10 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 120
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-10 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 120
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the holder of a certain Class C per diem alcoholic beverages license in Montgomery County to purchase alcoholic beverages from a County Department of Liquor Control warehouse, a dispensary, a manufacturer with a self-distribution license or certain permit, or a certain retail dealer.
Title
Montgomery County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class C Per Diem Licenses MC 8-18
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-24 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-03-08 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 138 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2018-03-08 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 138 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-10 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 120 |
2018-03-29 | House | Returned Passed |
2018-03-28 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2018-03-26 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2018-03-23 | Senate | Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-03-09 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2018-03-08 | House | Third Reading Passed (137-0) |
2018-03-07 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2018-03-07 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2018-03-06 | House | Favorable Report by Economic Matters |
2018-02-19 | House | Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-01-17 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
Subjects
Alcoholic Beverages - By Subdivision
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Dealers
Industry and Technology
Montgomery County
Retail Sales
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Dealers
Industry and Technology
Montgomery County
Retail Sales