MD HB1479 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 480
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring, in Calvert County, that certain subdivision plats be prepared and endorsed by certain individuals in a certain manner; requiring certain subdivision plats or deeds of dedication to include a certain signed and acknowledged statement; authorizing the filing, recording, and indexing of certain subdivision plats in a certain manner; establishing that recordation of a certain subdivision plat operates as a transfer of a certain easement to the Board of County Commissioners of Calvert County for certain purposes; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Calvert County - Subdivision Plats - Stormwater Management Easements

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-18 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-17 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 133 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-05-08HouseEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 480
2020-03-18HouseReturned Passed
2020-03-18SenateThird Reading Passed (44-0)
2020-03-18SenateFavorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
2020-03-18SenateFavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2020-03-17SenateReferred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2020-03-17HouseThird Reading Passed (133-0)
2020-03-16HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2020-03-16HouseFavorable with Amendments {870117/1 Adopted
2020-03-16HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
2020-02-18HouseHearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-02-07HouseFirst Reading Environment and Transportation

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Calvert County15501(n/a)See Bill Text
Calvert County15502(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback