MD HB1479 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 480
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 480
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring, in Calvert County, that certain subdivision plats be prepared and endorsed by certain individuals in a certain manner; requiring certain subdivision plats or deeds of dedication to include a certain signed and acknowledged statement; authorizing the filing, recording, and indexing of certain subdivision plats in a certain manner; establishing that recordation of a certain subdivision plat operates as a transfer of a certain easement to the Board of County Commissioners of Calvert County for certain purposes; etc.
Title
Calvert County - Subdivision Plats - Stormwater Management Easements
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-18 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-17 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 133 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2020-03-17 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 133 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-08 | House | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 480 |
2020-03-18 | House | Returned Passed |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (44-0) |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2020-03-17 | Senate | Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2020-03-17 | House | Third Reading Passed (133-0) |
2020-03-16 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2020-03-16 | House | Favorable with Amendments {870117/1 Adopted |
2020-03-16 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation |
2020-02-18 | House | Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-02-07 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
Subjects
Assessments
Calvert County
Clerks of Court
Counties - Local Laws
County Commissioners
Deeds
Easements
Engineers
Flood Control
Land Records
Prices
Real Property
Recordation
Surveyors
Titles
Zoning and Planning
Calvert County
Clerks of Court
Counties - Local Laws
County Commissioners
Deeds
Easements
Engineers
Flood Control
Land Records
Prices
Real Property
Recordation
Surveyors
Titles
Zoning and Planning
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Calvert County | 15 | 501 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Calvert County | 15 | 502 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |