MD HB1477 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on May 12 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-12 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 250
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on May 12 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-12 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 250
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing Washington County to impose a certain tax on the amounts paid for certain accommodations in or services provided by a mobile home park; repealing provisions of law authorizing Washington County to impose, by ordinance, a tax on the use of a mobile home in the county; repealing a requirement that the Director of the State Department of Assessments and Taxation direct the Department to assess the value of certain mobile homes in Washington County under certain circumstances; and applying the Act retroactively.
Title
Washington County - Mobile Home Parks and Mobile Home Tax - Revisions and Repeal
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2022-04-09 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-03-21 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 129 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2022-03-21 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 129 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-12 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 250 |
2022-04-09 | House | Returned Passed |
2022-04-09 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (43-0) |
2022-04-08 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2022-04-08 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2022-04-08 | Senate | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-03-21 | Senate | Referred Budget and Taxation |
2022-03-21 | House | Third Reading Passed (129-0) |
2022-03-19 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2022-03-19 | House | Favorable with Amendments {783027/1 Adopted |
2022-03-19 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means |
2022-03-11 | House | Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-03-11 | House | Rereferred to Ways and Means |
2022-02-28 | House | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations |
Subjects
Assessments
Assessments and Taxation, Department of
Counties - Local Laws
Laws and Ordinances
Mobile and Manufactured Homes
Property Tax
Taxes - Miscellaneous - Local
Washington County
Assessments and Taxation, Department of
Counties - Local Laws
Laws and Ordinances
Mobile and Manufactured Homes
Property Tax
Taxes - Miscellaneous - Local
Washington County
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Local Government | 20 | 501 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Local Government | 20 | 503 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Tax - Property | 2 | 202.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |