MD HB1477 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-03-06 - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Establishing that certain requirements that apply to a person walking on a highway also apply to a person running on a highway; authorizing a pedestrian to walk or run along and on a bike lane or shoulder adjacent to a roadway regardless of the presence of a sidewalk; and requiring the driver of a vehicle to yield the right-of-way to a pedestrian who is walking or running along and on a bike lane or shoulder under certain circumstances.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Vehicle Laws - Pedestrians - Rights and Requirements

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-06HouseUnfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
2020-03-03HouseHearing canceled
2020-02-10HouseHearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-02-07HouseFirst Reading Environment and Transportation

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Transportation21506(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback