MD HB1475 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-08 - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Health and Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-08 - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Health and Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Secretary of Health, on request of a unit of local government, to delegate to the unit of local government the authority to inspect and to conduct site visits and full surveys of related institutions and nursing homes; and requiring related institutions and nursing homes to report certain information to a unit of local government if the Secretary has delegated inspection authority.
Title
Health Facilities - Delegation of Inspection Authority - Related Institutions and Nursing Homes
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-08 | House | Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m. |
2024-03-04 | House | Rereferred to Health and Government Operations |
2024-02-14 | House | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations |
Same As/Similar To
SB825 (Crossfiled) 2024-03-16 - Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Subjects
Health
Health Care Facilities
Health Care Facilities and Regulation
Health, Department of
Inspections
Nursing Homes
Reports
Rules and Regulations
Health Care Facilities
Health Care Facilities and Regulation
Health, Department of
Inspections
Nursing Homes
Reports
Rules and Regulations
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Health - General | 19 | 1406 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health - General | 19 | 1408 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health - General | 19 | 1413.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health - General | 19 | 1414 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health - General | 19 | 304 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health - General | 19 | 308 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |