MD HB1474 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-02-10 - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Hearing: Mar 10 @ 1:00 pm House Appropriations Hearing
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring that the pay rate for certain employees at Clifton T. Perkins Hospital be at least two grades higher than the employee's pay rate effective June 30, 2020; requiring that the pay rate for certain employees in the Behavioral Health Administration or the Developmental Disabilities Administration be equal to the pay rate effective on July 1, 2020, for similarly trained, qualified, or licensed employees at Clifton T. Perkins Hospital under certain circumstances; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State Personnel - Maryland Department of Health - Pay Rates and Staffing Requirements

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-10HouseHearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-02-07HouseFirst Reading Appropriations

Same As/Similar To

SB693 (Crossfiled) 2020-02-17 - Hearing 3/06 at 12:00 p.m. (Finance)

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
State Personnel and Pensions8203(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback