MD HB1474 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 17 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-03-18 - Referred Budget and Taxation
Pending: Senate Budget and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring that the pay rate for certain employees at Clifton T. Perkins Hospital be at least two grades higher than the employee's pay rate effective June 30, 2020; requiring that the pay rate for certain employees in the Behavioral Health Administration or the Developmental Disabilities Administration be equal to the pay rate effective on July 1, 2020, for similarly trained, qualified, or licensed employees at Clifton T. Perkins Hospital under certain circumstances; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State Personnel - Maryland Department of Health - Pay Rates and Staffing Requirements

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-17 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 125 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-18SenateReferred Budget and Taxation
2020-03-17HouseThird Reading Passed (125-9)
2020-03-17HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2020-03-17HouseFavorable with Amendments {734661/1 Adopted
2020-03-17HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
2020-02-24HouseHearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-02-24HouseHearing canceled
2020-02-10HouseHearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-02-07HouseFirst Reading Appropriations

Same As/Similar To

SB693 (Crossfiled) 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 576

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
State Personnel and Pensions8203(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback