MD HB1474 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-12 - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-12 - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Motor Vehicle Administration to revoke a person's driver's license or privilege for 1 to 3 years if the person is convicted of carrying or possessing a firearm on school property under certain circumstances; requiring a court to notify a person that the person's driver's license or privilege shall be revoked for a conviction; requiring a court to notify the Administration of the conviction of certain persons for carrying or possessing a firearm on school property; etc.
Title
Driver's Licenses - Revocation for Firearms on School Property
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-12 | House | Unfavorable Report by Judiciary |
2018-03-02 | House | Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-02-19 | House | Hearing canceled |
2018-02-28 | House | Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-02-09 | House | First Reading Judiciary |
Subjects
Courts
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes
District Courts
Drivers' Licenses
Guns
Motor Vehicle Administration
Notices
Public Schools
Vehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes
District Courts
Drivers' Licenses
Guns
Motor Vehicle Administration
Notices
Public Schools
Vehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration