MD HB1473 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-9)
Status: Passed on May 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-08 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 527
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Establishing the Emergency Use Auto-Injectable Epinephrine Program at Institutions of Higher Education; authorizing individuals employed by a food service facility or a recreation and wellness facility at an eligible institution to obtain, store, and administer auto-injectable epinephrine under certain circumstances; requiring an eligible institution to designate the employees who are certified to be responsible for the storage, maintenance, and control of auto-injectable epinephrine; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public Health - Emergency Use Auto-Injectable Epinephrine Program at Institutions of Higher Education

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-03 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (133-1) (Y: 134 N: 2 NV: 7 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-04-01 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (44-0) (Y: 45 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-03-12 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-0) (Y: 137 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-08HouseApproved by the Governor - Chapter 527
2018-04-09HousePassed Enrolled
2018-04-09HouseThird Reading Passed (133-1)
2018-04-09HouseHouse Concur - Senate Amendments
2018-04-06SenateThird Reading Passed with Amendments (44-0)
2018-04-05SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2018-04-05SenateFavorable with Amendments {277377/1 Report Adopted
2018-04-05SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Finance
2018-04-03SenateHearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-03-16SenateFirst Reading Finance
2018-03-15HouseThird Reading Passed (136-0)
2018-03-14HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2018-03-13HouseSpecial Order until next session (Delegate Morhaim) Adopted
2018-03-13HouseFavorable with Amendments {266682/1 Report Adopted
2018-03-12HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
2018-03-02HouseHearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-02-09HouseFirst Reading Health and Government Operations

Subjects


Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?id=hb1473&stab=01&pid=billpage&tab=subject3&ys=2018rs
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/bills/hb/hb1473f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/bills/hb/hb1473t.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/bills/hb/hb1473e.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/Chapters_noln/CH_527_hb1473e.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2018RS/amds/bil_0003/hb1473_26668201.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2018RS/amds/bil_0003/hb1473_27737701.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/fnotes/bil_0003/hb1473.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes_comm/hb1473_hgo.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes/House/0474.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes_comm/hb1473_fin.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes/Senate/1247.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes/House/1477.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback