MD HB1471 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-03-09 - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Prohibiting the delegation of responsibilities of guardianship of a disabled person to a certain staff person if the delegation would result in the staff person being responsible for more than 26 guardianships.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Guardianship of Disabled Persons - Delegation of Responsibilities - Limitation

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-09HouseUnfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
2020-03-04HouseHearing canceled
2020-02-10HouseHearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-02-07HouseFirst Reading Health and Government Operations

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Estates and Trusts13707(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback