MD HB1471 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-09 - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-09 - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting the delegation of responsibilities of guardianship of a disabled person to a certain staff person if the delegation would result in the staff person being responsible for more than 26 guardianships.
Title
Guardianship of Disabled Persons - Delegation of Responsibilities - Limitation
Sponsors
Del. Tony Bridges [D] | Del. Dalya Attar [D] | Del. Regina Boyce [D] | Del. Frank Conaway [D] |
Del. Nick Mosby [D] | Del. Nicole Williams [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-09 | House | Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn |
2020-03-04 | House | Hearing canceled |
2020-02-10 | House | Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-02-07 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
Subjects
Aging, Department of
Disabilities
Disabled
Elderly
Estates and Trusts
Parents and Guardians
Weights and Measures
Work, Labor and Employment
Disabilities
Disabled
Elderly
Estates and Trusts
Parents and Guardians
Weights and Measures
Work, Labor and Employment
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Estates and Trusts | 13 | 707 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |