MD HB1468 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-7)
Status: Passed on April 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-01 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 3
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-7)
Status: Passed on April 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-01 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 3
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Allowing a subtraction modification under the Maryland income tax for individuals who are at least 55 years old for the first $15,000 of income from a certain employee retirement system that is attributable to the individual's employment as a public safety employee; providing that retirement income of public safety employees that is included in the subtraction allowed under the Act may not be taken into account for purposes of a Maryland income tax subtraction modification for certain retirement income; etc.
Title
Income Tax - Retirement Income Subtraction Modifications and Senior Credit
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-01 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-30 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-03-30 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-01 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 3 |
2022-04-01 | House | Returned Passed |
2022-04-01 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2022-04-01 | Senate | Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day Const/Rule 24 (Senator Guzzone) Adopted |
2022-04-01 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2022-04-01 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2022-04-01 | Senate | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation |
2022-04-01 | Senate | Rereferred to Budget and Taxation |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Referred Rules |
2022-03-30 | House | Third Reading Passed (137-0) |
2022-03-29 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2022-03-29 | House | Floor Amendment {953825/1 (Delegate Luedtke) Adopted |
2022-03-29 | House | Favorable with Amendments {753829/1 Adopted |
2022-03-29 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means |
2022-03-11 | House | Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-03-11 | House | Rereferred to Ways and Means |
2022-02-26 | House | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations |
Subjects
Age
Correctional Officers
Emergency Medical Services
Emergency Services
Exemptions
Fire Protection
Income Tax
Law Enforcement
Rescue Squads
Retirement
Tax Credits
Taxes - Income
Correctional Officers
Emergency Medical Services
Emergency Services
Exemptions
Fire Protection
Income Tax
Law Enforcement
Rescue Squads
Retirement
Tax Credits
Taxes - Income
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Tax - General | 10 | 207 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Tax - General | 10 | 209 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Tax - General | 10 | 754 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |