MD HB1468 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on April 9 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-04-09 - Returned Passed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Establishing the Job Access and Reverse Commute Program in the Maryland Transit Administration; authorizing the Administration to make certain grants under the Program to certain providers for certain employment and commuter projects; providing for the distribution of funds under the Program; requiring the Administration to conduct certain solicitations before accepting grant applications under the Program; requiring the Governor to provide up to $400,000 annually in the State budget for the Program; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Transit - Job Access and Reverse Commute (JARC) Program

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-02 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (44-0) (Y: 45 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-03-15 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-0) (Y: 137 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 8) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-09HouseReturned Passed
2018-04-09SenateThird Reading Passed (44-0)
2018-04-06SenateSecond Reading Passed
2018-04-06SenateFavorable Report Adopted
2018-04-06SenateFavorable Report by Finance
2018-03-29SenateHearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance)
2018-03-19SenateFirst Reading Finance and Budget and Taxation
2018-03-19HouseThird Reading Passed (136-0)
2018-03-17HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2018-03-17HouseFavorable with Amendments {930015/1 Report Adopted
2018-03-17HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
2018-03-09HouseHearing 3/09 at 2:30 p.m.
2018-03-06HouseHearing canceled
2018-03-09HouseHearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-02-09HouseFirst Reading Environment and Transportation

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback