MD HB1467 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on May 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-08 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 489
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring the Secretary of Health to establish a Sepsis Public Awareness Campaign Workgroup; providing for the membership of the Workgroup; requiring the Workgroup to develop a certain public awareness campaign, identify, review, and evaluate certain resources, and identify cost-effective methods for dissemination of certain information; and requiring the Workgroup to report to certain committees of the General Assembly on or before December 1, 2018.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public Health - Sepsis Public Awareness Campaign Workgroup

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-24 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-02 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 138 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-08HouseApproved by the Governor - Chapter 489
2018-03-29HouseReturned Passed
2018-03-28SenateThird Reading Passed (47-0)
2018-03-27SenateSecond Reading Passed
2018-03-27SenateFavorable Report Adopted
2018-03-26SenateFavorable Report by Finance
2018-03-22SenateHearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-03-05SenateFirst Reading Finance
2018-03-02HouseThird Reading Passed (137-0)
2018-02-28HouseSecond Reading Passed
2018-02-28HouseFavorable Report Adopted
2018-02-27HouseFavorable Report by Health and Government Operations
2018-02-20HouseHearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-02-09HouseFirst Reading Health and Government Operations

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback